open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:5:14-cv-06578
    Party Name:LUNDY v. PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:October 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:July 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:July 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:June 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:June 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Application/Petition]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.paed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?498033
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 1 =