open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:15-cv-00819
    Party Name:LINK v. PENNSYLVANIA STATE POLICE et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 58 Judgment]
    Date Published:November 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:November 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:November 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report and Recommendation]
    Date Published:October 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:August 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:August 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Recusal]
    Date Published:July 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:July 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Response/Briefing Schedule]
    Date Published:July 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:July 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:July 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:July 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:July 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:July 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Recusal]
    Date Published:June 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:June 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies)]
    Date Published:June 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:June 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?211160
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =