open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:20-cr-00049-1
    Party Name:USA v. GREEN
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Superseding Information]
    Date Published:September 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
    Date Published:July 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Release/Reduced Sentence pursuant to CARES and/or First Step Act]
    Date Published:July 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum]
    Date Published:May 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice re: Cancellation of Hearing]
    Date Published:May 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response in Support]
    Date Published:May 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
    Date Published:May 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reconsideration]
    Date Published:April 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)]
    Date Published:April 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [MAG Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:April 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)]
    Date Published:April 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal]
    Date Published:April 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reduce Sentence pursuant to Section 404 of FIRST STEP ACT]
    Date Published:April 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
    Date Published:April 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Protective Order]
    Date Published:April 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
    Date Published:March 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Release from Custody]
    Date Published:March 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum (NOT SENTENCING MEMORANDUM)]
    Date Published:November 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Entry of Judgment of Forfeiture]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Entry of Judgment of Forfeiture]
    Date Published:September 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Certified Copy of Order]
    Date Published:September 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Audio File]
    Date Published:August 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Suspend Sentence]
    Date Published:August 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reentry/Drug Court Proceedings]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [MAG Order Scheduling a Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:July 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [New Trial ]
    Date Published:July 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Speedy Trial Delay]
    Date Published:July 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence]
    Date Published:July 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other) (DO NOT USE FOR NOTICE OF APPEAL)]
    Date Published:June 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reduce Sentence]
    Date Published:April 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Unseal Case]
    Date Published:April 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:April 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:April 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Pretrial Detention]
    Date Published:April 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Arrest]
    Date Published:April 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Letter to Unseal]
    Date Published:April 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
    Date Published:April 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
    Date Published:March 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Petition for Action on Cond. of Ptrl Release]
    Date Published:March 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Quash]
    Date Published:December 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Quash]
    Date Published:December 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:[Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:November 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:[Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:November 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:[Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court - Magistrate Judge Case]
    Date Published:November 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Warrant]
    Date Published:November 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant ]
    Date Published:November 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Memorandum]
    Date Published:November 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:[Plea and Sentence]
    Date Published:November 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:[Add Counts]
    Date Published:November 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Lunch]
    Date Published:September 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bench Trial - Begun]
    Date Published:September 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bench Trial - Completed]
    Date Published:September 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Verdict]
    Date Published:September 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
    Date Published:September 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Trial]
    Date Published:September 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Voir Dire]
    Date Published:September 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Presence of Court Reporter]
    Date Published:September 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Conference]
    Date Published:August 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript - RESTRICTED]
    Date Published:August 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:August 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Copy of TPO Form]
    Date Published:August 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request]
    Date Published:June 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of US Passport]
    Date Published:June 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:June 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:[Commitment to Another District]
    Date Published:June 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:[Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:June 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Status Conference]
    Date Published:June 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:May 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Docket Call]
    Date Published:May 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:April 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:April 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
    Date Published:April 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:April 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
    Date Published:April 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Trial Brief]
    Date Published:April 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Verdict Sheet]
    Date Published:April 03, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Proposed Jury Instructions]
    Date Published:April 03, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:March 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Plea Entered]
    Date Published:March 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Document]
    Date Published:March 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Joinder]
    Date Published:March 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to admit]
    Date Published:March 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Discovery]
    Date Published:March 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
    Date Published:March 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Compel]
    Date Published:March 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Compel]
    Date Published:March 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Admit]
    Date Published:March 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Proposed Voir Dire]
    Date Published:March 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:February 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:February 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Information to Establish Prior Conviction]
    Date Published:January 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:January 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:January 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:January 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:January 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:January 03, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:December 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:December 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:December 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:December 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:December 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Writ]
    Date Published:December 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Warrant]
    Date Published:December 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:December 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:December 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond]
    Date Published:December 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
    Date Published:December 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Probation]
    Date Published:December 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Referring Motion]
    Date Published:November 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
    Date Published:October 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Minute Entry - Multicase]
    Date Published:September 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence re: 782 Amendment]
    Date Published:August 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:August 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
    Date Published:May 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Seal Document]
    Date Published:May 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:April 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Dismiss]
    Date Published:April 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:April 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:April 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Discovery]
    Date Published:March 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Tentative Findings]
    Date Published:February 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:February 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
    Date Published:January 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk's Entry of Default]
    Date Published:January 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Disposition of Adversary]
    Date Published:January 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
    Date Published:January 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Default Judgment]
    Date Published:January 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice of Dismissal]
    Date Published:January 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
    Date Published:January 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extend Time]
    Date Published:January 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
    Date Published:January 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:December 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Complaint]
    Date Published:December 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Judgment]
    Date Published:December 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:November 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
    Date Published:November 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript - PDF]
    Date Published:November 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Order]
    Date Published:October 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
    Date Published:October 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Vacate]
    Date Published:October 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Modify]
    Date Published:October 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Modify]
    Date Published:October 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
    Date Published:September 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Postpone and/or Reschedule]
    Date Published:September 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Postpone and/or Reschedule]
    Date Published:September 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Bail]
    Date Published:September 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:September 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum Opinion]
    Date Published:August 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:August 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:June 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:June 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Stay]
    Date Published:June 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Recusal]
    Date Published:June 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Stay]
    Date Published:June 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Vacate (2255)]
    Date Published:June 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Response/Briefing Schedule]
    Date Published:May 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:May 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment - Default]
    Date Published:May 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Entry of Default]
    Date Published:May 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Default Entered]
    Date Published:May 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit]
    Date Published:May 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request for Default Judgment]
    Date Published:May 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request for Default]
    Date Published:May 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:May 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript - No PDF]
    Date Published:April 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion for Hearing]
    Date Published:April 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:April 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Waiver of Service Executed]
    Date Published:March 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
    Date Published:March 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Unseal Document]
    Date Published:March 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Hearing]
    Date Published:March 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Sealed Motion]
    Date Published:March 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies)]
    Date Published:February 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:February 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Leave to File]
    Date Published:February 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
    Date Published:February 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Seal]
    Date Published:February 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Exhibit]
    Date Published:February 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:February 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Produce]
    Date Published:February 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Seal]
    Date Published:February 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Seal (Public Entry - Judicial Document)]
    Date Published:February 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Clerks Notice to USCA]
    Date Published:February 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Eligible for Arbitration]
    Date Published:February 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:February 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:February 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
    Date Published:February 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bail]
    Date Published:February 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Document]
    Date Published:February 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reply to Response]
    Date Published:February 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue Sentence]
    Date Published:February 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum]
    Date Published:February 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Writ of Garnishment]
    Date Published:February 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Produce]
    Date Published:January 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Presentence Order]
    Date Published:January 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:January 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:January 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:January 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:January 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:December 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
    Date Published:December 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
    Date Published:December 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:December 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Mandate]
    Date Published:November 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:November 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appear Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Required)]
    Date Published:November 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal]
    Date Published:November 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Leave to File Documents Under Seal]
    Date Published:November 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Order]
    Date Published:November 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amended Judgment to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment - 3582c2]
    Date Published:October 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment - 3582c2]
    Date Published:October 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:August 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response in Opposition]
    Date Published:August 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:August 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment on Probation/Supervised Release Violation]
    Date Published:August 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Suppress]
    Date Published:July 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:July 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Supplement]
    Date Published:July 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:July 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:July 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:July 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:July 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum and/or Opinion]
    Date Published:July 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum and/or Opinion Order]
    Date Published:July 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:July 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:June 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Appointment]
    Date Published:June 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:June 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Petition for Warrant or Summons]
    Date Published:June 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:June 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment of Forfeiture]
    Date Published:June 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
    Date Published:June 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response]
    Date Published:June 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Motion]
    Date Published:May 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Request for Modifying the Conditions of Supervision]
    Date Published:May 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report and Order of Probation]
    Date Published:April 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Petition for Supervised Release Action]
    Date Published:April 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Document Filed]
    Date Published:April 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:March 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice re: 782 Amendment]
    Date Published:March 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:March 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Petition for Probation Action]
    Date Published:February 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request and Order to Modify Supervision]
    Date Published:February 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:February 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
    Date Published:January 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Remark]
    Date Published:January 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Praecipe to Satisfy Judgment]
    Date Published:January 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Order]
    Date Published:December 17, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment 3582c2]
    Date Published:December 11, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:December 05, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:December 03, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter]
    Date Published:December 02, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?217634
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =