open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:10-cv-01553
    Party Name:POLLOCK et al v. ENERGY CORPORATION OF AMERICA
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Release of Bond Obligation]
    Date Published:January 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Release of Bond Obligation]
    Date Published:January 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
    Date Published:March 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extend Time]
    Date Published:March 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:February 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:February 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:February 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Reopen Case]
    Date Published:February 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reopen Case]
    Date Published:February 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statistical Case Closing]
    Date Published:July 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
    Date Published:July 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Stay]
    Date Published:July 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stay]
    Date Published:July 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Relief of Judgment]
    Date Published:June 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
    Date Published:June 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum Opinion & Order]
    Date Published:June 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?194287
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =