open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:1:16-cv-00236
    Party Name:STEINHOFF v. COLVIN
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
    Date Published:April 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 58 Judgment]
    Date Published:January 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:January 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:March 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:February 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:January 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Social Security Appeal Order]
    Date Published:December 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:October 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:October 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:October 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Response/Briefing Schedule]
    Date Published:September 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Attorney Fees]
    Date Published:September 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?220118
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =