open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:11-12339-sr
    Party Name:Booker T. Farrior and Gwendolyn E. Farrior
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Document]
    Date Published:April 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:March 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Redact]
    Date Published:March 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:March 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Redact (Fee Per Case)]
    Date Published:March 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:January 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Close Case]
    Date Published:January 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Close Case]
    Date Published:January 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:January 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Automatic Order Discharging Debtor (Chapter13)]
    Date Published:January 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing -Notice of Objection to Discharge]
    Date Published:December 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Notice of Objection to Discharge]
    Date Published:December 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report Closed Completed]
    Date Published:December 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Response to Notice of Final Cure Payment Rule 3002.1]
    Date Published:May 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Notice of Final Cure Mortgage Payment]
    Date Published:May 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Domestic Support Obligation Certification]
    Date Published:April 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: REIGLE, FREDERICK L. [Praecipe to Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.paeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?402552
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =