open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:1:17-bk-02968-
    Party Name:Mark P. Bohner
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [BNC Certificate of Notice (Final Decree)]
    Date Published:November 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [BNC Certificate of Notice (Discharge (Chapter 7))]
    Date Published:November 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor - Ch. 7]
    Date Published:October 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - no funds collected]
    Date Published:September 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [Certificate of Financial Management OR Certification About a Financial Management Course (Form 423)]
    Date Published:August 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [Order on Motion For Relief From Stay]
    Date Published:August 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [Hearing canceled (PUBLIC ENTRY - do not use with a private event)]
    Date Published:August 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [Auto-docket of credit card]
    Date Published:July 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [Automatic Stay (Relief from)]
    Date Published:July 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [BNC Certificate of Notice (Notice of Trustee Rejection)]
    Date Published:July 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [BNC Certificate of Notice (341 Meeting Notice (Chapter 7))]
    Date Published:July 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [Rejection of Trustees Appointment and Appointment of Successor Trustee]
    Date Published:July 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Frank, (Trustee) Lawrence G. [Meeting of Creditors (Ch. 7 and 13)]
    Date Published:July 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Haller, (Trustee) Leon P. [Meeting of Creditors (Ch. 7 and 13)]
    Date Published:July 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Haller, (Trustee) Leon P. [Automatic Assignment-Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:July 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Haller, (Trustee) Leon P. [Exhibit]
    Date Published:July 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Haller, (Trustee) Leon P. [Auto-docket of credit card]
    Date Published:July 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Exhibit]
    Date Published:July 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Auto-docket of credit card]
    Date Published:July 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Haller, (Trustee) Leon P. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:July 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Haller, (Trustee) Leon P. [Employee Income Records (Payment Advices, Pay Stubs, Pay Advices)]
    Date Published:July 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:July 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records (Payment Advices, Pay Stubs, Pay Advices)]
    Date Published:July 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Haller, (Trustee) Leon P. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:July 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Haller, (Trustee) Leon P. [Creditor List Uploaded (docket event previously named Matrix Filed)]
    Date Published:July 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:July 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Creditor List Uploaded (docket event previously named Matrix Filed)]
    Date Published:July 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [BNC Certificate of Notice (Final Decree)]
    Date Published:December 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Final Decree (Ch. 13 Cases)]
    Date Published:December 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Review of Ch. 13 Final Report (all payments made)]
    Date Published:November 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Final Report of Ch. 13 Trustee (batch)]
    Date Published:November 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:October 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Response to Notice of Final Cure Payment Rule 3002.1]
    Date Published:September 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Notice of Final Cure Mortgage Payment Rule 3002.1]
    Date Published:September 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [BNC Certificate of Notice (Discharge (Chapter 13))]
    Date Published:September 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Discharge of Debtor]
    Date Published:September 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Certification in Support for LR 3015 (LBF 3015-3(a) LBF 3015-3(b) LBF 3015-3(c) OF 2830 LBF 3015-6)]
    Date Published:September 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Certificate of Financial Management OR Certification About a Financial Management Course (Form 423)]
    Date Published:September 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Change of Address]
    Date Published:September 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Plan Payments Completed (Ch. 13 Cases ONLY)]
    Date Published:August 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) or Petition Preparer (Form 2800)]
    Date Published:July 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Order on Application for allowance of compensation and expenses]
    Date Published:October 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change Rule 3002.1]
    Date Published:October 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Compensation & Expenses]
    Date Published:October 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Automatic Stay (Relief from)]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pamb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?229009
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =