open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:4:13-bk-05253-
    Party Name:Valley Forge Composite Technologies, Inc.
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neblett, (Trustee) John P [Order on Motion for Approval of Interim Distribution and Fee Applications]
    Date Published:October 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neblett, (Trustee) John P [Approval of Interim Distribution and Fee Applications]
    Date Published:September 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neblett, (Trustee) John P [PDF document]
    Date Published:September 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neblett, (Trustee) John P [Approving/Denying Withdrawal]
    Date Published:February 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neblett, (Trustee) John P [Failure to Include Revisable Order]
    Date Published:February 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neblett, (Trustee) John P [Appearance (Entry and/or Withdrawal)]
    Date Published:February 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neblett, (Trustee) John P [Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice]
    Date Published:February 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neblett, (Trustee) John P [Appear pro hac vice]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neblett, (Trustee) John P [Order Reassigning Case JJT]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neblett, (Trustee) John P [Answer]
    Date Published:October 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neblett, (Trustee) John P [Joinder]
    Date Published:October 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neblett, (Trustee) John P [Notice of Telephonic Court Appearance]
    Date Published:October 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neblett, (Trustee) John P [Order on Motion To Reconsider, Alter, Amend or Vacate Order]
    Date Published:September 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neblett, (Trustee) John P [Expedited Consideration]
    Date Published:September 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neblett, (Trustee) John P [Reconsider, Alter, Amend or Vacate Order]
    Date Published:September 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neblett, (Trustee) John P [Fee application cover sheet was not filed (LBR 2016-1(a))]
    Date Published:July 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neblett, (Trustee) John P [Order on Motion to Approve Compromise or Settlement/Stipulation]
    Date Published:November 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neblett, (Trustee) John P [Approve Compromise or Settlement/Stipulation]
    Date Published:October 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neblett, (Trustee) John P [Close/Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (public entry, sends emails, no doc # or PDF)]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neblett, (Trustee) John P [Order on Application for allowance of compensation and expenses]
    Date Published:December 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neblett, (Trustee) John P [Order of the Court (docket after docketing Opinion)]
    Date Published:December 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neblett, (Trustee) John P [Opinion of the Court]
    Date Published:December 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neblett, (Trustee) John P [Transcript of Testimony]
    Date Published:December 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neblett, (Trustee) John P [Change of Address]
    Date Published:October 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neblett, (Trustee) John P [Compensation & Expenses]
    Date Published:October 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neblett, (Trustee) John P [Order on Application to Employ]
    Date Published:October 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neblett, (Trustee) John P [Employ (do NOT use to Employ/Appoint an Examiner, Ombudsman, Trustee)]
    Date Published:October 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neblett, (Trustee) John P [Proceeding Memo (multipurpose event)]
    Date Published:August 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neblett, (Trustee) John P [Request to Continue Hearing/Trial with Concurrence (LBF 9013-3)]
    Date Published:August 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neblett, (Trustee) John P [WordPerfect Template (NTFP)]
    Date Published:August 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neblett, (Trustee) John P [Transfer Case or Adversary Proceeding/Change Venue]
    Date Published:July 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neblett, (Trustee) John P [Withdrawal of the Reference]
    Date Published:July 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neblett, (Trustee) John P [Auto-docket of credit card]
    Date Published:July 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neblett, (Trustee) John P [Exhibit]
    Date Published:July 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neblett, (Trustee) John P [Dismiss a Pleading]
    Date Published:July 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neblett, (Trustee) John P [Complaint]
    Date Published:July 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neblett, (Trustee) John P [Hearing]
    Date Published:July 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neblett, (Trustee) John P [Objection]
    Date Published:July 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neblett, (Trustee) John P [Certificate of Service (or Certificate of Mailing)]
    Date Published:July 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neblett, (Trustee) John P [BNC Certificate of Notice (Order)]
    Date Published:June 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neblett, (Trustee) John P [Correspondence (Issued BY the Court)]
    Date Published:June 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neblett, (Trustee) John P [Certificate of Service was not filed]
    Date Published:June 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neblett, (Trustee) John P [Request for Notices under 2002]
    Date Published:June 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neblett, (Trustee) John P [Notice and Certificate of Service (NOT for sale motions)]
    Date Published:June 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neblett, (Trustee) John P [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:June 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Telephonic Court Appearance]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pamb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?230758
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =