open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:11-23010-
    Party Name:Gene R. Penvose and Kimberly J. Penvose
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:February 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Final Decree]
    Date Published:February 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Ch 13 UST Form 13-FR-S -batch-]
    Date Published:February 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Receipt of Funds for Registry Account]
    Date Published:January 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Chapter 13 Trustees Report of Receipts and Disbursements]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Extend Time]
    Date Published:December 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
    Date Published:October 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Approving Report of Receipts and Disbursements]
    Date Published:October 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Response to Notice of Final Cure Mortgage Payment]
    Date Published:September 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Hearing Set on Trustee Application]
    Date Published:August 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Motion for Approval of Report of Receipts and Disbursements - Plan Completed]
    Date Published:August 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Notice of Final Cure Mortgage Payment]
    Date Published:August 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:June 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Terminate Wage Attachment]
    Date Published:June 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Certification of Discharge Eligibility - Ch 13]
    Date Published:May 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:May 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing-bk]
    Date Published:November 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:November 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Notice of Claims Filed And Intention to Pay Claims -batch-]
    Date Published:October 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Declaration Re: Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?295470
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =