open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:11-cv-04679
    Party Name:DUBREY v. SEPTA et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Conference]
    Date Published:October 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:October 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Settlement Conference]
    Date Published:June 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case - 41(b)]
    Date Published:June 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:June 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:June 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Jury Interrogatories]
    Date Published:May 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Voir Dire]
    Date Published:May 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Verdict Sheet]
    Date Published:May 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Jury Instructions]
    Date Published:May 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion in Limine]
    Date Published:May 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [In Limine]
    Date Published:May 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial Memorandum]
    Date Published:May 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines]
    Date Published:March 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:March 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:March 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Suspense Order]
    Date Published:February 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
    Date Published:February 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation and Order]
    Date Published:February 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:February 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Strike]
    Date Published:February 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:February 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:February 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
    Date Published:February 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum and/or Opinion Order]
    Date Published:January 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum and/or Opinion]
    Date Published:January 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:July 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
    Date Published:July 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:December 01, 2014
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.paed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?488437
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =