open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:14-cv-06469
    Party Name:LEISER et al v. THE FIRST LIBERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case - 41(b)]
    Date Published:September 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:August 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:August 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Remand to State Court]
    Date Published:July 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.paed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?497838
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =