open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:13-cv-01501
    Party Name:HALL v. SENECA AREA EMERGENCY SERVICES, INC.
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
    Date Published:September 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:August 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
    Date Published:August 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Sealed Motion]
    Date Published:August 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File]
    Date Published:August 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [In Limine]
    Date Published:August 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Documents Under Seal]
    Date Published:August 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal]
    Date Published:August 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:August 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:July 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial Order]
    Date Published:June 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:June 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:June 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?212872
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =