open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:14-cv-00448
    Party Name:BURNSWORTH v. Q.E.P. CO., INC et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statistical Case Closing]
    Date Published:January 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Take Deposition]
    Date Published:December 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Take Deposition]
    Date Published:December 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:December 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:December 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Management Order]
    Date Published:November 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Hearing]
    Date Published:October 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal]
    Date Published:October 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
    Date Published:September 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Sanctions]
    Date Published:September 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Sealed Motion]
    Date Published:September 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion in Limine]
    Date Published:September 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:August 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Response/Briefing Schedule]
    Date Published:August 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Documents Under Seal]
    Date Published:August 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
    Date Published:August 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File]
    Date Published:August 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies)]
    Date Published:August 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [In Limine]
    Date Published:August 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:July 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Continue]
    Date Published:July 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:July 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:July 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Sealed Motion]
    Date Published:June 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?215878
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =