open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:5:14-bk-05311-
    Party Name:Gary W. Fischer and Bronwyn A.D. Fischer
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [BNC Certificate of Notice (Final Decree)]
    Date Published:March 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Final Decree (Ch. 13 Cases)]
    Date Published:March 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [BNC Certificate of Notice (Discharge (Chapter 13))]
    Date Published:February 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Discharge of Debtor]
    Date Published:February 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Review of Ch. 13 Final Report (all payments made)]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Final Report of Ch. 13 Trustee (batch)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Certification in Support for LR 3015 (LBF 3015-3(a) LBF 3015-3(b) LBF 3015-3(c) OF 2830 LBF 3015-6)]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Consent]
    Date Published:January 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Notice of Final Cure Mortgage Payment Rule 3002.1]
    Date Published:January 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Plan Payments Completed (Ch. 13 Cases ONLY)]
    Date Published:January 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Auto-docket of credit card]
    Date Published:December 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Request for Certified Document/Order]
    Date Published:December 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:November 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Order on Motion to Use, Sale, Lease or Prohibit or Condition the use, sale or lease of property]
    Date Published:November 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Order on Motion to Modify Plan]
    Date Published:November 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Modify Plan (Post Confirmation)]
    Date Published:October 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Use, Sale, Lease or Prohibit or Condition of Property]
    Date Published:October 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Order on Motion For Relief From Stay]
    Date Published:July 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Hearing canceled (PUBLIC ENTRY - do not use with a private event)]
    Date Published:July 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Terminate Motion to Dismiss (w/ability to Cancel Hearing) PUBLIC ENTRY]
    Date Published:June 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss (material default OR copy Federal tax return)]
    Date Published:June 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Motion to Dismiss Ch. 13 Case by Trustee (11 USC 521 and 1307(c)) (material default OR tax returns)]
    Date Published:June 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Order on Motion to Approve Compromise or Settlement/Stipulation]
    Date Published:May 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Approve Compromise or Settlement/Stipulation]
    Date Published:April 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Approving/Denying Stipulation]
    Date Published:January 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Stipulation]
    Date Published:January 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Order on Motion to Modify Plan]
    Date Published:January 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:December 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Order on Application to Employ]
    Date Published:December 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Employ (do NOT use to Employ/Appoint an Examiner, Ombudsman, Trustee)]
    Date Published:December 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Withdrawal]
    Date Published:December 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Objection to Ch. 13 Plan by Trustee]
    Date Published:December 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Proceeding Memo Order (Judge Thomas Cases ONLY)]
    Date Published:December 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Modify Plan (Post Confirmation)]
    Date Published:December 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Answer]
    Date Published:December 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Notice and Certificate of Service (NOT for sale motions)]
    Date Published:November 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Auto-docket of credit card]
    Date Published:November 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Automatic Stay (Relief from)]
    Date Published:November 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Proceeding Memo (confirmation hearing held, plan eligible for confirmation) (Record Made)]
    Date Published:August 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Incomplete and/or Deficient Filing (f/k/a Missing documents)]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pamb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?237865
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =