open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:4:15-bk-05289-
    Party Name:John F. Lucas, III and Sherri A. Lucas
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Order Reassigning Case JJT]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Approving/Denying Stipulation]
    Date Published:March 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Stipulation]
    Date Published:March 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Motion to Dismiss Ch. 13 Case by Trustee (11 USC 521 and 1307(c))(mat def, tax ret, plan pay, unconf]
    Date Published:February 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Terminate Motion to Dismiss (w/ability to Cancel Hearing) PUBLIC ENTRY]
    Date Published:August 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss (material default OR copy Federal tax return)]
    Date Published:August 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Motion to Dismiss Ch. 13 Case by Trustee (11 USC 521 and 1307(c)) (material default OR tax returns)]
    Date Published:July 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Confirmation of Plan (Approval or Denial)]
    Date Published:May 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Proceeding Memo (confirmation hearing held, plan eligible for confirmation) (Record Made)]
    Date Published:May 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Request for Payment of Ch. 13 Compensation and Expenses (LBF 2016-2(c))]
    Date Published:May 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Certification of Execution of Rights and Responsibilities Agreement (LBF 2016-2(a))]
    Date Published:May 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Amended Chapter 13 Plan (Pre-Confirmation)]
    Date Published:March 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Certification in Support for LR 3015(LBF3015-3(a), LBF3015-3(b), LBF3015-3(c), LBF3015-5, LBF3015-6)]
    Date Published:March 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Objection to Ch. 13 Plan by Trustee]
    Date Published:March 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [BNC Certificate of Notice (Notice setting Confirmation Hearing)]
    Date Published:February 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [BNC Certificate of Notice (Chapter 12/13 Plan)]
    Date Published:February 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Request to BNC - Notice (Confirmation Hearing and Plan) (batch)]
    Date Published:February 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Meeting of Creditors Held (Ch. 13) and Confirmation Hearing Set]
    Date Published:February 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [BNC Certificate of Notice (Notice of Rescheduled or Reconvened 341 Meeting)]
    Date Published:January 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Meeting of Creditors Rescheduled (inclement weather, Acts of God, sudden illness)]
    Date Published:January 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Order on Motion to Extend, Impose or Reimpose Automatic Stay]
    Date Published:January 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Hearing canceled (PUBLIC ENTRY - do not use with a private event)]
    Date Published:January 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Certificate of No Objection]
    Date Published:January 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:December 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [BNC Certificate of Notice (Notice regarding Motion to Extend Automatic Stay)]
    Date Published:December 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Order on Motion for (or termination of) Wage Attachment]
    Date Published:December 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Semi-passive (Automatic Stay (Motion to Extend OR Impose))]
    Date Published:December 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Automatic Stay (Extend, Impose or Reimpose)]
    Date Published:December 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Certificate of Service (or Certificate of Mailing)]
    Date Published:December 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Certificate of Service was not filed]
    Date Published:December 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [BNC Certificate of Notice (341 Meeting Notice (Chapter 13))]
    Date Published:December 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Wage Attachment Order (or termination of)]
    Date Published:December 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Meeting of Creditors (Ch. 7 and 13)]
    Date Published:December 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Automatic Assignment-Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:December 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Plan (Ch. 13) (NOT to be used for Amended Plans)]
    Date Published:December 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Plan (Ch. 13) (NOT to be used for Amended Plans)]
    Date Published:December 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Employee Income Records (Payment Advices, Pay Stubs, Pay Advices)]
    Date Published:December 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Auto-docket of credit card]
    Date Published:December 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Employee Income Records (Payment Advices, Pay Stubs, Pay Advices)]
    Date Published:December 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Auto-docket of credit card]
    Date Published:December 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Creditor List Uploaded (docket event previously named Matrix Filed)]
    Date Published:December 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:December 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Creditor List Uploaded (docket event previously named Matrix Filed)]
    Date Published:December 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:December 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:December 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:December 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Final Report of Ch. 13 Trustee (batch)]
    Date Published:December 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [BNC Certificate of Notice (Order Dismissing)]
    Date Published:October 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Proceeding Memo (multipurpose event)]
    Date Published:October 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss (material default OR copy Federal tax return)]
    Date Published:July 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J. [Terminate Motion to Dismiss (w/ability to Cancel Hearing) PUBLIC ENTRY]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pamb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?231209
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =