open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:14-70743-
    Party Name:Hayes Large Architects, LLP
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Proof of Transmittal of Order of Dist. and Final Rpt to UST]
    Date Published:June 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Withdrawal of Claim]
    Date Published:April 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Order Approving Omnibus Motion to Withdraw as Attorney - multi-]
    Date Published:March 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Certificate of Costs]
    Date Published:March 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Request for Clerk's Certificate of Costs]
    Date Published:March 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Order Approving Omnibus Motion to Substitute Attorney at Miscellaneous No. 18-00203 -multi-]
    Date Published:June 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Response -Non-motion related for attorney use-]
    Date Published:February 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Order Approving Omnibus Motion to Substitute Attorney at Miscellaneous No. 18-00201 -multi-]
    Date Published:January 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019]
    Date Published:January 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Close Adversary Case]
    Date Published:June 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Disposition of Adversary]
    Date Published:June 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Generic Motion]
    Date Published:April 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Approve Settlement]
    Date Published:April 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Request to Postpone Payment of Fees]
    Date Published:November 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Complaint]
    Date Published:November 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Order -Non-motion related-]
    Date Published:May 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Requiring Certification Under 5005(b)(2)]
    Date Published:April 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Response]
    Date Published:April 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:April 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Extend Time]
    Date Published:April 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Notice of Filing of Transcript]
    Date Published:April 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Transcript]
    Date Published:April 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Hearing Set F]
    Date Published:April 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Quash]
    Date Published:April 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Proposed Order]
    Date Published:April 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Transcript Request]
    Date Published:April 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Report of Sale]
    Date Published:April 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Notice of Review of Bankruptcy Petition]
    Date Published:April 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Fixing Deadline to Deny a Motion]
    Date Published:April 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Notice]
    Date Published:April 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Reconsider]
    Date Published:April 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:March 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Proof of Publication of Notice of Sale]
    Date Published:March 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Objection]
    Date Published:March 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Notice of Intent to Sell]
    Date Published:February 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Sale of Property under Section 363(b)]
    Date Published:February 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Notice of Terminated Trustee or Attorney]
    Date Published:February 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Withdraw As Attorney]
    Date Published:February 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:February 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Withdraw As Attorney - PAWB Form 17]
    Date Published:February 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Compensation]
    Date Published:February 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Attachment D]
    Date Published:January 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Amended Schedules D E F]
    Date Published:January 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [none]
    Date Published:January 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Notice Regarding Modification to Mailing Matrix - Local Bankruptcy Form 30]
    Date Published:January 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 Business/Corporation Held]
    Date Published:January 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Certificate of No Objection]
    Date Published:January 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Certificate of Service - PAWB Form 7]
    Date Published:December 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Hearing on a Judge Deller Case Set by Attorney or Trustee]
    Date Published:December 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:December 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Employ]
    Date Published:November 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Financial Report]
    Date Published:November 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing-bk]
    Date Published:November 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:November 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:November 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 Asset Business/Corporation]
    Date Published:November 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Notice Appointing Trustee]
    Date Published:November 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Convert Case 11 to 7]
    Date Published:November 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:November 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
    Date Published:November 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 11 [Administrative Expenses]
    Date Published:November 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 11 [Withdraw/Dismiss Document]
    Date Published:November 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 11 [Withdraw/Dismiss Document -bk-]
    Date Published:November 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 11 [Objection to Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:November 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Deposition]
    Date Published:November 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
    Date Published:November 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 11 [Report -Generic-]
    Date Published:October 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 11 [Expedite Hearing]
    Date Published:September 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 11 [Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364]
    Date Published:September 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 11 [Convert Case from 11 to 7]
    Date Published:September 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 11 [none]
    Date Published:September 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure Statement for Small Business]
    Date Published:September 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Plan]
    Date Published:September 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 11 [Summary of Chapter 11 Plan]
    Date Published:September 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 11 [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:August 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of No Objection]
    Date Published:August 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:July 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Continued]
    Date Published:July 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 11 [Compensation]
    Date Published:July 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 11 [Hearing on a Judge Deller Case Set by Attorney or Trustee]
    Date Published:July 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 11 [Response]
    Date Published:July 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:June 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 11 [Financial Report]
    Date Published:June 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 11 [Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
    Date Published:June 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service - PAWB Form 7]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?327598
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =