open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:16-cv-05093
    Party Name:BROWN v. COLVIN
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:July 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:July 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:May 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:May 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines]
    Date Published:April 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:August 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:April 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:March 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:January 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:January 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:January 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Brief and Statement]
    Date Published:December 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report and Recommendation]
    Date Published:December 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:December 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:December 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
    Date Published:November 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
    Date Published:October 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [File Excess Pages]
    Date Published:October 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Praecipe/Request]
    Date Published:October 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Change Venue]
    Date Published:October 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:October 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remark]
    Date Published:September 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
    Date Published:September 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit of Service]
    Date Published:September 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:August 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:August 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Management Order]
    Date Published:August 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Social Security Appeal Order]
    Date Published:August 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Social Security Record]
    Date Published:August 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:August 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement]
    Date Published:August 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Change Venue]
    Date Published:June 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum and/or Opinion Order]
    Date Published:June 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum and/or Opinion]
    Date Published:June 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Hearing]
    Date Published:June 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:May 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:April 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:March 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remand]
    Date Published:March 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Directing Service]
    Date Published:January 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:January 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response]
    Date Published:December 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re: Report and Recommendation]
    Date Published:December 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objections]
    Date Published:December 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney]
    Date Published:November 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Procedural Order]
    Date Published:November 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued as to USA]
    Date Published:October 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:October 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation and Order]
    Date Published:October 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Application/Petition]
    Date Published:October 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Suspense Order]
    Date Published:October 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:October 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:September 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:September 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Response/Briefing Schedule]
    Date Published:August 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Attorney Fees]
    Date Published:August 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:July 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:June 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:June 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Verbal Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:June 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:June 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
    Date Published:June 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Standing Practice Order 13-9 in Social Security Appeals]
    Date Published:May 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Administrative Record]
    Date Published:May 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:January 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:December 17, 2014
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:December 08, 2014
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?220161
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =