open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:5:12-cv-06094
    Party Name:NEWELL v. TRADITIONS OF HANOVER et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment - Clerk]
    Date Published:March 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Costs Taxed]
    Date Published:March 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response]
    Date Published:February 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Order]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Notice of Docketing ROA]
    Date Published:March 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objections]
    Date Published:March 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Appeal Fees]
    Date Published:March 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:March 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Notice to USCA]
    Date Published:March 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appeal]
    Date Published:March 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Attorney Fees]
    Date Published:February 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Bill of Costs]
    Date Published:February 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum and/or Opinion Order]
    Date Published:February 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum and/or Opinion]
    Date Published:February 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Cancelling Deadline]
    Date Published:November 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Settlement Conference]
    Date Published:August 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:August 20, 2015
  • Source: https://ecf.paed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?469450
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =