open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:19-cv-00825
    Party Name:WINKLES v. HARBOR FREIGHT TOOLS USA, INC.
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Response/Briefing Schedule]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stay]
    Date Published:September 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:September 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:September 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.pawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?258110
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =