U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00303
  • Case Name: DEAL v. LAWRENCE COUNTY et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • May 07, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • May 05, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 05, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • May 05, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Correct]
  • March 18, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 13, 2025: [Expedite]
  • March 13, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.