open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

RHODE ISLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island
    Case Number:1:13-cv-00718
    Party Name:Alex and Ani, LLC v. Elite Level Consulting, LLC et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Stay]
    Date Published:January 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stay]
    Date Published:January 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:January 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:November 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:October 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Compel]
    Date Published:October 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:October 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:September 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:September 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Compel]
    Date Published:September 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:September 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:September 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:September 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Return of Property]
    Date Published:September 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:September 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
    Date Published:September 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:September 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
    Date Published:August 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
    Date Published:August 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:August 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Preliminary Injunction]
    Date Published:August 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Seal Document]
    Date Published:August 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:August 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Settlement Conference]
    Date Published:August 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:July 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
    Date Published:July 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:July 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:July 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:June 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:June 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.rid.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?36001
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =