open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

RHODE ISLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island
    Case Number:1:13-cv-00125
    Party Name:Ghorayeb et al v. Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds]
    Date Published:September 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disbursement of Funds]
    Date Published:September 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:August 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
    Date Published:August 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.rid.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?34378
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =