open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

RHODE ISLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Rhode Island
    Case Number:1:13-cr-00135-1
    Party Name:USA v. Fall
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Exhibit Return]
    Date Published:April 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Mandate]
    Date Published:June 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Judgment]
    Date Published:April 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Remark]
    Date Published:April 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript - Redacted- Appeal]
    Date Published:February 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript - Appeal]
    Date Published:February 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Supplemental Record Sent USCA]
    Date Published:January 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:January 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:January 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter]
    Date Published:November 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment Returned Executed]
    Date Published:October 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Returning Document]
    Date Published:July 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:June 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.rid.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?35728
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =