open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

RHODE ISLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island
    Case Number:1:12-cv-00781
    Party Name:West v. Hoover et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Mandate]
    Date Published:March 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Judgment]
    Date Published:March 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Opinion]
    Date Published:March 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Case Number]
    Date Published:February 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk's Certificate and Appellate Cover Sheet Re: Appeal Record]
    Date Published:February 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appeal]
    Date Published:February 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:January 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:January 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Compel]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.rid.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?33626
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =