open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

RHODE ISLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island
    Case Number:1:13-cv-00777
    Party Name:Conservation Law Foundation v. Broadrock Gas Services, LLC et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:October 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:July 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:April 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Settlement Conference]
    Date Published:April 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:March 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Hearing Cancelled]
    Date Published:January 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:January 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:January 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Mediation]
    Date Published:January 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:November 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
    Date Published:June 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines]
    Date Published:June 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:June 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 16 Statement]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.rid.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?36297
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =