open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

RHODE ISLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Rhode Island
    Case Number:1:14-cr-00076-1
    Party Name:USA v. Perry
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:October 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:October 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [In Chambers Conference]
    Date Published:October 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:September 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:July 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:December 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
    Date Published:November 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response in Opposition]
    Date Published:October 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Early Termination of Probation]
    Date Published:October 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment Returned Executed]
    Date Published:September 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment on Revocation of Supervised Release]
    Date Published:August 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:August 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
    Date Published:August 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
    Date Published:June 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Status Conference]
    Date Published:June 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
    Date Published:June 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
    Date Published:June 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:June 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:June 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:June 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest ]
    Date Published:June 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:June 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Recusal]
    Date Published:June 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:February 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
    Date Published:October 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
    Date Published:January 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing Defendant Request]
    Date Published:May 28, 2014
  • Filing Type:[Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:May 19, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.rid.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?281
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =