open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

RHODE ISLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Rhode Island
    Case Number:1:13-cr-00175-1
    Party Name:USA v. Keener
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
    Date Published:April 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:March 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
    Date Published:December 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extend Time]
    Date Published:December 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript Request]
    Date Published:December 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Vacate (2255)]
    Date Published:December 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter]
    Date Published:November 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing Defendant Request]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.rid.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?36220
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =