open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

RHODE ISLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island
    Case Number:1:12-cv-00301
    Party Name:Morales v. Chadbourne et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Judgment]
    Date Published:May 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report]
    Date Published:April 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Case Number]
    Date Published:March 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk's Certificate and Appellate Cover Sheet Re: Appeal Record]
    Date Published:March 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appeal]
    Date Published:March 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:February 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:February 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:January 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transcript]
    Date Published:April 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transcript Request Rescinded]
    Date Published:March 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:March 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transcript Request]
    Date Published:February 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Redacted Document]
    Date Published:February 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:January 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Hearing Cancelled]
    Date Published:January 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
    Date Published:January 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Substitute Party]
    Date Published:January 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:December 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:December 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:December 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:December 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
    Date Published:November 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Seal Document]
    Date Published:November 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement of Disputed Facts]
    Date Published:November 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration]
    Date Published:November 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:November 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement of Undisputed Facts]
    Date Published:September 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Substitute Party]
    Date Published:September 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:September 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Exhibit in Support]
    Date Published:September 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:September 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:September 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Continue]
    Date Published:September 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Mandate]
    Date Published:September 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:July 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:July 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:July 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
    Date Published:June 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:June 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
    Date Published:June 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:June 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.rid.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?32419
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =