open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

RHODE ISLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Rhode Island
    Case Number:1:18-cr-00144-1
    Party Name:USA v. Martinez
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Downward Departure]
    Date Published:May 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:May 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:May 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript - Appeal]
    Date Published:December 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:October 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:October 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Supplemental Record Sent USCA]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment Returned Executed]
    Date Published:August 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:August 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transfer-In of Supervision]
    Date Published:July 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Case Number]
    Date Published:July 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Clerk's Certificate and Appellate Cover Sheet Re: Appeal Record]
    Date Published:June 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Appeal - Conviction/Final Judgment]
    Date Published:June 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition]
    Date Published:May 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:December 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Early Termination of Probation]
    Date Published:December 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript Order Acknowledgment (Form Attached)]
    Date Published:October 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Indictment]
    Date Published:October 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement Hearing]
    Date Published:October 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Information - Felony]
    Date Published:October 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter]
    Date Published:March 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript]
    Date Published:March 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript Order Acknowledgment]
    Date Published:March 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript Order]
    Date Published:March 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letters of Character]
    Date Published:November 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Expedite]
    Date Published:November 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum]
    Date Published:November 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Expedite]
    Date Published:November 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Intent to Plead Guilty]
    Date Published:September 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Hearing Cancelled]
    Date Published:September 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Waiver (Other)]
    Date Published:July 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
    Date Published:April 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
    Date Published:April 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Unseal Case]
    Date Published:April 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Release Bond Obligation]
    Date Published:January 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Release Bond Obligation]
    Date Published:January 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:January 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:January 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:January 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:November 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Dismiss Forfeiture Allegation]
    Date Published:October 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Dismiss Forfeiture Allegation]
    Date Published:October 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:October 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Plea Entered]
    Date Published:October 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing Cancelled]
    Date Published:September 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:September 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Calendar Call]
    Date Published:July 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:July 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:July 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:July 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:June 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment Order]
    Date Published:April 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:April 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:April 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:April 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Appearance Bond]
    Date Published:March 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:March 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Exhibit/Witness List]
    Date Published:March 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
    Date Published:March 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Preliminary Hearing]
    Date Published:March 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Bond Hearing]
    Date Published:March 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:March 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:March 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:March 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Order of Detention]
    Date Published:March 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:March 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:March 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:March 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Arrest ]
    Date Published:March 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:March 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
    Date Published:March 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Complaint]
    Date Published:March 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing Defendant Request]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.rid.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1531
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =