open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

RHODE ISLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island
    Case Number:1:14-cv-00223
    Party Name:Anthony et al v. Honeywell International Inc. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Hearing Cancelled]
    Date Published:November 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Settlement Conference]
    Date Published:November 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Referred]
    Date Published:November 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:October 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:October 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:August 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Continue]
    Date Published:August 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing (Form Attached)]
    Date Published:August 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:August 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:August 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:June 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
    Date Published:May 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response]
    Date Published:May 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply Memorandum]
    Date Published:April 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
    Date Published:March 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:March 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:February 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:February 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Partial Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:February 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:January 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:January 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement of Undisputed Facts]
    Date Published:December 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:December 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Quash]
    Date Published:September 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:August 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Seal]
    Date Published:August 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:August 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Seal]
    Date Published:August 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Quash]
    Date Published:August 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:March 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:March 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:February 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Compel]
    Date Published:January 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Compel]
    Date Published:January 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition]
    Date Published:November 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:November 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:June 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:June 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:April 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:March 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:March 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:February 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:January 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
    Date Published:October 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
    Date Published:October 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:August 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines]
    Date Published:August 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [In Chambers Conference]
    Date Published:June 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.rid.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?37020
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 1 =