open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

RHODE ISLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Rhode Island
    Case Number:1:19-cr-00110-1
    Party Name:USA v. Nieves
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:January 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Plea Entered]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Indictment]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:September 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Conditionally Assigned]
    Date Published:September 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Information - Felony]
    Date Published:September 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Probation 12-B Request for Modification w/Consent]
    Date Published:August 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amended Judgment]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Corrective Docket Entry]
    Date Published:January 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum]
    Date Published:January 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response in Opposition]
    Date Published:December 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing Defendant Request]
    Date Published:December 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Status Report ]
    Date Published:October 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:June 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:June 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:June 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Vacate (2255)]
    Date Published:June 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter]
    Date Published:January 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:November 13, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Permanently Assigned]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.rid.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?36965
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =