open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

RHODE ISLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island
    Case Number:1:14-cv-00077
    Party Name:K.S. v. Rhode Island Board of Education et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report]
    Date Published:May 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
    Date Published:November 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [In Chambers Conference]
    Date Published:November 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:November 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Referred]
    Date Published:October 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:October 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response]
    Date Published:September 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:August 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Attorney Fees]
    Date Published:July 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Order]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Substitute Party]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Conference]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Substitute Party]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:May 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:May 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Mandate]
    Date Published:April 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:November 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing (Form Attached)]
    Date Published:November 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Opinion]
    Date Published:October 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Judgment]
    Date Published:October 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appeal Transcript]
    Date Published:July 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Case Number]
    Date Published:May 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk's Certificate and Appellate Cover Sheet Re: Appeal Record]
    Date Published:May 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appeal]
    Date Published:May 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:May 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:May 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:March 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
    Date Published:January 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:September 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:July 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:July 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:July 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:July 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:March 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Certify Class]
    Date Published:March 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:January 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:January 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:January 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:December 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:November 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:November 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:August 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:July 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transcript - Redacted]
    Date Published:July 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Redaction Request - Transcript]
    Date Published:July 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transcript]
    Date Published:July 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection to Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:July 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:July 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:July 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:June 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.rid.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?36581
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =