open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

RHODE ISLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island
    Case Number:1:14-cv-00140
    Party Name:Gazaille v. A & B Anesthesia Associates, LLC et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report]
    Date Published:January 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
    Date Published:August 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:August 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Compel]
    Date Published:July 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:July 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:June 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Quash]
    Date Published:June 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Compel]
    Date Published:June 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Subpoena Returned Executed or Unexecuted]
    Date Published:April 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corrective Docket Entry]
    Date Published:April 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Quash]
    Date Published:April 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Settlement Conference]
    Date Published:January 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:September 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Hearing Cancelled]
    Date Published:September 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Continue]
    Date Published:September 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:August 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:August 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:August 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:August 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Counterclaim]
    Date Published:August 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:August 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
    Date Published:August 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remark]
    Date Published:August 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:August 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:July 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:July 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:July 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:July 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:July 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
    Date Published:June 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines]
    Date Published:June 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
    Date Published:June 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 16 Statement]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.rid.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?36771
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 1 =