open-public-records

U.S. District Court for the District of Rhode Island

RHODE ISLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. District Court for the District of Rhode Island
    Case Number:1:07-md-01842
    Party Name:In Re: Kugel Mesh Hernia Patch Products Liability Litigation
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion to Intervene]
    Date Published:August 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Intervene]
    Date Published:July 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:June 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Rule 16 Statement]
    Date Published:October 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:[~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:July 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Remark]
    Date Published:May 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion to Remand to State Court]
    Date Published:May 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Remand to State Court]
    Date Published:April 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Hearing Cancelled]
    Date Published:March 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Proposed Voir Dire]
    Date Published:March 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Proposed Jury Instructions]
    Date Published:March 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Exhibit in Support]
    Date Published:March 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Response in Opposition]
    Date Published:February 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Disclosure]
    Date Published:February 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Statement of Disputed Facts]
    Date Published:February 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Stay]
    Date Published:January 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:[In Limine]
    Date Published:January 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Statement of Undisputed Facts]
    Date Published:January 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:January 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Remand]
    Date Published:January 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion to Strike]
    Date Published:January 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Strike]
    Date Published:December 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Reply Memorandum]
    Date Published:December 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion for Leave to File]
    Date Published:December 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Response to Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:December 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:November 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:November 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Settlement Conference]
    Date Published:November 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:November 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:November 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:November 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion to Show Cause]
    Date Published:October 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
    Date Published:October 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:October 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:October 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:October 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Show Cause]
    Date Published:October 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:September 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion for Protective Order]
    Date Published:September 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:September 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:September 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:September 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion to Seal Document]
    Date Published:September 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Memorandum in Opposition]
    Date Published:September 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:August 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Response in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:August 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Transcript Request Rescinded]
    Date Published:August 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Continue]
    Date Published:August 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Transcript]
    Date Published:August 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion to Vacate]
    Date Published:August 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Notice of Hearing on Motion]
    Date Published:August 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:August 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Seal Document]
    Date Published:August 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Reconsideration]
    Date Published:August 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:August 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion to Compel]
    Date Published:August 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Response to Motion]
    Date Published:August 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:July 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Protective Order]
    Date Published:July 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Pretrial Memorandum]
    Date Published:July 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Compel]
    Date Published:July 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:July 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:July 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Transcript Request]
    Date Published:June 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:June 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Order]
    Date Published:June 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Stipulation]
    Date Published:June 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Extension of Time]
    Date Published:June 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:[In Chambers Conference]
    Date Published:June 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:June 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.rid.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?22506
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =