open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

RHODE ISLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island
    Case Number:1:09-cv-00169
    Party Name:Cook v. Wall et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:November 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:October 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [In Chambers Conference]
    Date Published:September 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:September 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:September 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:September 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:July 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
    Date Published:July 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Quash]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.rid.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?26001
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =