open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

RHODE ISLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island
    Case Number:1:13-cv-00510
    Party Name:Devaney v. Kilmartin
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Mandate]
    Date Published:August 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Judgment]
    Date Published:July 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:August 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:June 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:June 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Case Number]
    Date Published:June 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk's Certificate and Appellate Cover Sheet Re: Appeal Record]
    Date Published:June 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.rid.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?35338
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =