open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

RHODE ISLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island
    Case Number:1:14-cv-00137
    Party Name:Ovalles et al v. Sony Electronics Inc. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
    Date Published:March 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
    Date Published:March 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:March 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Continue]
    Date Published:March 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:August 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:August 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:August 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appoint Guardian/Attorney ad Litem]
    Date Published:July 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appoint Guardian/Attorney ad Litem]
    Date Published:July 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:June 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Public Docket Note]
    Date Published:May 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Exhibit/Witness List]
    Date Published:May 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Seal]
    Date Published:March 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reconsideration]
    Date Published:March 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit]
    Date Published:February 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Vacate]
    Date Published:February 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motions Referred]
    Date Published:February 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Vacate]
    Date Published:February 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:January 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:December 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:December 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:December 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:November 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corrective Docket Entry]
    Date Published:September 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Sanctions]
    Date Published:September 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Conference]
    Date Published:September 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:July 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:July 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transcript - Redacted]
    Date Published:July 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Redaction Request - Transcript]
    Date Published:July 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Strike]
    Date Published:June 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Compel]
    Date Published:June 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
    Date Published:June 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:June 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transcript]
    Date Published:June 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transcript Request]
    Date Published:June 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:June 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:June 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
    Date Published:June 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw]
    Date Published:June 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Opposition]
    Date Published:June 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
    Date Published:June 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:May 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
    Date Published:May 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [In Chambers Conference]
    Date Published:May 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:May 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:April 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Exhibit in Support]
    Date Published:April 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition]
    Date Published:April 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:April 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:March 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Sur-Reply to Reply to Motion Response]
    Date Published:March 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
    Date Published:March 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:March 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:January 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:January 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Hearing Cancelled]
    Date Published:January 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:January 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines]
    Date Published:January 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:January 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
    Date Published:December 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:December 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:November 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:November 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:November 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:October 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:October 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Hearing]
    Date Published:October 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Hearing]
    Date Published:October 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Support]
    Date Published:October 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Strike]
    Date Published:October 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Compel]
    Date Published:October 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Subpoena Returned Executed or Unexecuted]
    Date Published:September 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.rid.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?36769
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =