open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

RHODE ISLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island
    Case Number:1:12-cv-00368
    Party Name:Iacobbo v. The Hertz Corporation et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:November 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:November 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Settlement Conference]
    Date Published:September 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:September 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Continue]
    Date Published:August 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:July 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:July 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.rid.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?32661
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =