open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

RHODE ISLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00109
    Party Name:Proietti v. United States of America
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:March 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:March 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Settlement Conference]
    Date Published:March 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:January 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:January 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Hearing Cancelled]
    Date Published:November 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:November 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:November 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Continue]
    Date Published:November 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 16 Conference]
    Date Published:July 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:July 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remark]
    Date Published:July 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 16 Statement]
    Date Published:July 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.rid.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?36855
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =