U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:14-cr-00121-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Bowie et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Dismiss]
July, 2017
  • July 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 10, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
June, 2017
  • June 20, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 20, 2017: [Order]
  • June 13, 2017: [Vacate (2255)]
May, 2017
  • May 17, 2017: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • May 17, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
April, 2016
  • April 22, 2016: [Transcript]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Transcript Request]
December, 2015
  • December 14, 2015: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
October, 2015
  • October 23, 2015: [Judgment]
  • October 20, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • October 20, 2015: [Sentence Variation]
  • October 13, 2015: [Amended Judgment]
  • October 09, 2015: [Judgment]
  • October 08, 2015: [Sentencing]
September, 2015
  • September 16, 2015: [Continue]
  • September 16, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 16, 2015: [Notice of Hearing Cancelled]
  • September 11, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 11, 2015: [Notice of Hearing Cancelled]
  • September 10, 2015: [Continue]
August, 2015
  • August 21, 2015: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • August 14, 2015: [Judgment]
  • August 11, 2015: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • August 11, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 11, 2015: [Order on Motion for Three Level Decrease]
  • August 07, 2015: [Strike]
  • August 06, 2015: [Dismiss]
  • August 06, 2015: [Three Level Decrease]
June, 2015
  • June 25, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • June 24, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • June 19, 2015: [Sentence Variation]
  • June 12, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 12, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 12, 2015: [Notice of Hearing Defendant Request]
  • June 12, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2014
  • October 24, 2014: [Indictment]
  • October 24, 2014: [Notice of Hearing Defendant Request]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.