Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Rhode Island
    Case Number:1:18-cr-00153-1
    Party Name:USA v. McMillan
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:June 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Plea Entered]
    Date Published:June 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing Defendant Request]
    Date Published:May 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Hearing Cancelled]
    Date Published:May 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Intent to Plead Guilty]
    Date Published:May 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:January 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:January 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:January 10, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.rid.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?45410
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =