Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Rhode Island
    Case Number:1:19-cr-00012-1
    Party Name:USA v. Solis
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Appear as Law Student Counsel]
    Date Published:March 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appear as Law Student Counsel]
    Date Published:March 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:March 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Plea Entered]
    Date Published:March 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Hearing Cancelled]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Intent to Plead Guilty]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:March 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:March 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment Order]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender (Form Attached)]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest ]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing Defendant Request]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:February 07, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.rid.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?45908
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =