open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

RHODE ISLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00431
    Party Name:Anusiem v. Cuccinelli et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:September 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:September 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued as to USA]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Request]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Opening Notice (Form Attached)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint - New Case]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.rid.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?47292
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =