U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00065
  • Case Name: Bronson v. Town of South Kingstown et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2024
  • November 14, 2024: [Statement of Undisputed Facts]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Scheduling Order (form attached)]
  • June 29, 2022: [Stipulation]
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order]
  • March 01, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • February 15, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 15, 2022: [Affidavit of Service]
  • February 11, 2022: [State Court Record]
  • February 09, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • February 08, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • February 08, 2022: [Case Opening Notice (Form Attached)]
  • February 08, 2022: [Notice of Removal - New Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.