U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00066
  • Case Name: Storage Cap Leasing, LLC v. AP Properties, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 06, 2022: [Hearing Cancelled]
  • September 02, 2022: [Dismiss]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (Form Attached)]
  • August 26, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order Referring Case to ADR Mediation]
  • April 13, 2022: [Scheduling Order (form attached)]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 04, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 04, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 04, 2022: [Counterclaim]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 15, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 09, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • February 09, 2022: [Case Opening Notice (Form Attached)]
  • February 09, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • February 09, 2022: [Complaint - New Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.