U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00067
  • Case Name: Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Co. v. Fontaine et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Stipulation]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order]
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 24, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 24, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • October 20, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
  • October 10, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Reply to Response]
  • September 16, 2022: [Statement of Disputed Facts]
  • September 16, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 16, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 08, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 02, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • August 24, 2022: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • August 19, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 17, 2022: [In Chambers Conference]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • July 01, 2022: [Response to Motion]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 17, 2022: [Stay]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • June 06, 2022: [Stay]
May, 2022
  • May 29, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • May 29, 2022: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • May 26, 2022: [Stay]
  • May 16, 2022: [Rule 16 Conference]
  • May 09, 2022: [Rule 16 Statement]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 06, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (Form Attached)]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (Form Attached)]
  • March 09, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 08, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 01, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 22, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 11, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 10, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • February 10, 2022: [Case Opening Notice (Form Attached)]
  • February 10, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • February 09, 2022: [Complaint - New Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.