U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-bk-10700
  • Case Name: Jill V. Dickinson and Jonathan M. Dickinson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Pay Wages]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Terminate Document]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Withdrawal of Document (option of text only)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Chapter 13 Trustee Proposed Order Regarding Plan Payments]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Chapter 13 Trustee Proposed Order Confirming Ch 13 Plan]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Corrective Action Taken (TEXT ONLY)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Generic Application/Motion]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Hearing Not Held]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Order on Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Motion to Continue Hearing- Bankruptcy]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Order on Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Motion to Continue Hearing- Bankruptcy]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (pdf or text only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.