U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-bk-10654
  • Case Name: Christian H. Dunbar
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Suspend Plan Payments]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Consent]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Suspend Plan Payments]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
January, 2025
  • January 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
December, 2024
  • December 16, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • October 10, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • October 10, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Chapter 13 Form 122C-1 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period]
  • October 10, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Chapter 13 Form 122C-2 Calculation of Your Disposable Income]
  • October 10, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Missing Document(s) Filed]
  • October 10, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Chapter 13 Agreement - LF 2083-1.1]
  • October 10, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Update Other Deadlines]
  • October 10, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (pdf or text only)]
  • October 10, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Payment Advices]
  • October 04, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.