U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-bk-10666
  • Case Name: David J. Amerantes and Jo-Ann M. Amerantes
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Order on Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Motion to Continue Hearing- Bankruptcy]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Order on Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Motion to Continue Hearing- Bankruptcy]
November, 2024
  • November 13, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Chapter 13 Plan]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Extend Time]
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Extend Time-Bankruptcy]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.