U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-bk-10690
  • Case Name: Margaret E. Gallagher-Elmer
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Employ]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Corrective Action Required]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Terminate Document]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Employ]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Withdrawal of Document (option of text only)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Enforce]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Confirmation Hearing Set]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Extend Time]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Update Objection/Response Deadline]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Extend Time-Bankruptcy]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Hearing Not Held]
December, 2024
  • December 10, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Initial Financial Management Notice]
October, 2024
  • October 24, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Missing Document(s) Filed]
  • October 13, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Extend Time]
  • October 10, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Extend Time-Bankruptcy]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.